Hings, Ingrid Maria (CPSO#: 66273)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 1994