Hinkkala, Kaarlo Samuel (CPSO#: 88341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Hospitalist Office
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6001
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PRHC - Hospitalist Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: 705-743-2121 Ext. 3084
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Soldiers Memorial Hospital - Renal
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: 705-325-9129
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaarlo Hinkkala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hinkkala ( CPSO# 88341 )

Business Address:
LHSC Univeristy Hospital
Department of Nephrology
Room ALL - 139
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAARLO SAMUEL HINKKALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINKKALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2012