Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hinton, Stephen William (CPSO#: 55668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
791 Princess Street
Suite 201
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone: (613) 544-2727
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hinton and MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Macdonald ( CPSO# 52854 )
Dr. S. Hinton ( CPSO# 55668 )

Business Address:
Frontenac Medical Associates
791 Princess Street
Suite 201
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Business Address:
Queen's Family Health Centre
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Business Address:
Rideaucrest Home for the Aged
175 Rideau Street
Kingston ON  K7K 3H6
Phone Number: (613) 530-2818

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN WILLIAM HINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1987