Hirasaki, Yuji (CPSO#: 78757)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shiga Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 28 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005