Hirji, Zameer (CPSO#: 88571)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 11010 - 101 Street Northwest Edmonton, AB T5H 4B9
Date Received: 16 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014