Hirsh, Michael Stanley (CPSO#: 33415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 728-4605
Fax: (613) 728-3083
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Hirsh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hirsh ( CPSO# 33415 )

Business Address:
Suite 507
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 728-4605

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STANLEY HIRSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1992