Hirsz, Abraham Isaac (CPSO#: 31461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 522
Box 58/59
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hirsz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hirsz ( CPSO# 31461 )

Business Address:
522 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 591-1222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM ISAAC HIRSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1980