Hirte, Holger Wolfgang (CPSO#: 33754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Room 3-205G
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 67677
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. W. Hirte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hirte ( CPSO# 33754 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Room 3-205G
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOLGER WOLFGANG HIRTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987