Hiruki, Tadaaki (CPSO#: 58722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
British Columbia Cancer Agency
600 West 10th Avenue
Vancouver BC  V5Z 4E6
Phone: (604) 877-6000 Ext. 672133
Fax: (604) 877-6178

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TADAAKI HIRUKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRUKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1987