Hiscock, Susan Leslie (CPSO#: 57384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 160
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B1
Phone: (519) 284-1280
Fax: (519) 284-4816
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Hiscock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hiscock ( CPSO# 57384 )

Business Address:
268 Maiden Lane
2nd Floor
St Marys ON  N4X 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 284-1280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN LESLIE HISCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HISCOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1990