Hislop, Robert Ian (CPSO#: 59512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4500 Ext. 5214
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2670 Lakeshore Rd
Brights Grove ON  N0N 1C0
Canada
Phone: (519) 869-6900
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Hislop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hislop ( CPSO# 59512 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Business Address:
2600 Lakeshore Road
Brights Grove ON  N0N 1C0
Phone Number: (519) 869-6900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN HISLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HISLOP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989