Hitkari, Jason Adolph (CPSO#: 83531)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2007