Hitzler, Johann Karl (CPSO#: 63030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Universitat Ulm, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8887
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANN KARL HITZLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HITZLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1994