Hladunewich, Michelle Adrienne (CPSO#: 68296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: Hladunewich, Michelle (used until: 05 Dec 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CNIB - Kidney Care Centre
Division of Nephrology and
Obstetrical Medicine
3rd Floor, 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 480-4773
Fax: (416) 480-5755
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hladunewich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hladunewich ( CPSO# 68296 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology and Critical Care Medicine
Suite A139
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5954

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 May 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ADRIENNE HLADUNEWICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HLADUNEWICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2002