Hlousek, Daniela Blanka (CPSO#: 74816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores
Centre for Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Ext. 6290
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELA BLANKA HLOUSEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HLOUSEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005