Hlusek, Emilia (CPSO#: 41387)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:P.J. Safarika University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre 50 College Dr North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017