Ho, Ada Ka Yun (CPSO#: 92897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 King Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3C5
Phone: (519) 752-4340
Fax: (519) 752-6096
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wong & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 89026 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 92897 )

Business Address:
36 King Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 752-4340

Business Address:
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone Number: (905) 889-3634

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADA KA YUN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012