Ho, Ben (CPSO#: 74277)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2004