Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ho, Benjamin Bob Man (CPSO#: 59665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Benjamin Ho
#1-1101 Brock Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4M1
Phone: (905) 668-1676
Fax: (905) 668-5053
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Benjamin Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ho ( CPSO# 59665 )

Business Address:
1 - 1101 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1N 4M1
Phone Number: (905) 668-1676

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BOB MAN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989