Ho, Charmaine Shuk-Man (CPSO#: 71389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East York Medical Health Centre
Suite 27E
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Fax: (416) 696-7881
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARMAINE SHUK-MAN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999