Ho, Chia-Sing (CPSO#: 25133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department Of Medical Imaging
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 2679
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIA-SING HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1972