Ho, Doris Shi-Chung (CPSO#: 29645)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Doris Shi-Chung Ho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective December 19, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Ho’s practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Effective January 15, 2018 Dr. Ho resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.