Ho, Elaine Pui Lum (CPSO#: 68201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: Tang, Elaine Pui Lum (used until: 16 Oct 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Elaine & Vincent Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ho ( CPSO# 69135 )
Dr. E. Ho ( CPSO# 68201 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
1100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-6458

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
3200 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE PUI LUM HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996