Ho, Esther Ching Yee (CPSO#: 80938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Health Campus
Alberta Health Services
4448 Front Street SE
Calgary AB  T2M 1M4
Phone: (403) 956-1111
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Endersby & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER CHING YEE HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 May 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009