Ho, Francis Yip-Leung (CPSO#: 30173)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Heart Lake Medical Centre C/O Cathy - Office Manager 10425 Kennedy Road North Brampton, Ontario L6Z 0A4
Date Received: 01 Mar 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Jan 2000
Summary:

On January 31, 2000 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Ho’s plea of guilty and found him 
guilty of professional misconduct with regard to failing to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession.  The Committee subsequently ordered the following: 
 
1)    Dr. Ho to appear before the Committee  to be reprimanded; 
 
2)    The Committee directs the Registrar of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
   Ontario to: 
 
   a)       Record the fact of Dr. Ho’s reprimand on the register; 
   b)       Suspend Dr. Ho’s certificate of registration for three months, starting on a date to 
      be set by the Registrar after conferring with Dr. Ho but not more than sixty days after the 
      date of this order; 
 
   c)       Suspend the effect of the order in paragraph (c) above on the condition that, 
      within thirty days after the date of this order Dr. Ho agrees to, and subsequently 
      completes, the following:  
       
      i)    Dr. Ho will participate in and complete the Physician Review Program (PREP) by 
         October 31, 2000 at his own expense; 
       
       
      ii)      Dr. Ho will abide by the outcome of his participation in the PREP, including any 
         restrictions which arise out of the category he obtains in the PREP, which he 
         acknowledges to include: 
 
   (1) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 1 outcome, he need do nothing other than regular CME 
      activities and the suspension in paragraph (c) of this order will be stayed in perpetuity; 
 
   (2) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 2 or 3 outcome, he will undertake promptly any educational 
      activities and arrange promptly any educational supervision prescribed or recommended 
      by the PREP and participate in any reassessment (in the case of a category 3 outcome) 
      prescribed or recommended by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario; 
 
   (3) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 4 outcome, he will cease practising medicine except under 
      direct supervision and for the purpose of participating in structured educational activities, 
      such practice restrictions to continue until Dr. Ho is reassessed by the PREP and obtains a 
      category 1, 2 or 3 outcome; 
 
   (4) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 5 outcome, he will cease practicing medicine except in an 
      educational setting approved by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and 
      under close supervision, such practice restrictions to continue until Dr. Ho is reassessed 
      by the PREP and obtains a category 1, 2 or 3 outcome; 
       
(5) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 6 outcome, he will cease practicing medicine and submit to 
   any further assessment prescribed or recommended by the PREP. 
   d)    Suspend Dr. Ho’s certificate of registration for a period of three months, to 
         commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar in the event that Dr. Ho fails to 
         comply with paragraphs (c) (i) and (c) (ii) (1) through (5). 
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 31, 2000