Ho, Gerald Chu Leung (CPSO#: 61712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Ho, Chu-Leung Gerald (used until: 20 Mar 1991 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chalmers Gate Medical Building
Suite 306
328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone: (905) 731-5092
Fax: (905) 731-5106
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerald Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ho ( CPSO# 61712 )

Business Address:
Chalmers Gate Medical Building
306 - 328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone Number: (905) 731-5092

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD CHU LEUNG HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993