Ho, Hung-I Henry (CPSO#: 68060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
4789 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 0G3
Phone: (416) 221-8612
Fax: (416) 221-8784
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUNG-I HENRY HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1996