Ho, Jacqueline Sing Woon (CPSO#: 103436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 University Avenue
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Ontario, Canada
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE SING WOON HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016