Ho, Julia Wing Ying (CPSO#: 22223)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Lingnan University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000