Ho, Kenneth Siu Wai (CPSO#: 31271)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brampton Civic Hospital Health Record Department 2100 Bovaird Drive East Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Date Received: 13 Apr 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017