Ho, Peter Hin Tat (CPSO#: 69167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ho ( CPSO# 69167 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER HIN TAT HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003