Ho, Philip Chung-Yeung (CPSO#: 30635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3A - 2035 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 0A8
Phone: (416) 4909499
Fax: 416 4909351
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip C. Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ho ( CPSO# 30635 )

Business Address:
2983 Bloor Street West
Suite 3A
Toronto ON  M8X 1C1
Phone Number: (416) 232-2118

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP CHUNG-YEUNG HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1979