Ho, Ru-Chie (CPSO#: 24528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ru-Chie Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ho ( CPSO# 24528 )

Business Address:
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (950) 579-3628


Corporation Name: R. Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2012


Corporation Name: C. John Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ho ( CPSO# 24528 )
Dr. C. Ho ( CPSO# 75256 )

Business Address:
Athlete's Care
C 120 - 11 King Street
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone Number: (416) 368-9990

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RU-CHIE HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1972