Ho, Seck-Yin (CPSO#: 29544)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 31 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 May 2005