Ho, Tommy Kwok Leung (CPSO#: 67938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 803
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 596-1155
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ho ( CPSO# 67938 )

Business Address:
803-600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 596-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMMY KWOK LEUNG HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002