Ho, Victoria Yin Wan (CPSO#: 33836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Professional Centre
564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 403
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 742-2900
Fax: (519) 742-3140
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ho ( CPSO# 33836 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 742-2900

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA YIN WAN HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1982