Ho, Vincent Wan Kang (CPSO#: 69135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Elaine & Vincent Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Dr. V. Ho ( CPSO# 69135 )
Dr. E. Ho ( CPSO# 68201 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
1100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-6458

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
3200 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. VINCENT WAN KANG HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1997