Ho, Vincent Wing-Gay (CPSO#: 65392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Neonatal Intensive Care Unit
Royal Victoria Regional Health
Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 739-5624
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent W. G. Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ho ( CPSO# 65392 )

Business Address:
Neonatal Intensive Care Unit
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 739-5624

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT WING-GAY HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993