Ho, Yvonne (CPSO#: 71486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: (905) 813-3042
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

480 Bronte Street South
Suite 212
Milton ON  L9T 2X6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-8831
Fax: (905) 878-8832
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

MyHealth Centre
Credit Valley Imaging Associates
2300 Eglinton Avenu West,Suite G02
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Canada
Phone: 9058280653
Fax: 9058280765
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

209-2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Canada
Phone: 9056078334
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yvonne Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ho ( CPSO# 71486 )

Business Address:
Suite 209
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 607-8334

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999