Ho-Asjoe, Marianne Pui Kwan (CPSO#: 62375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6681 Victoria Drive
Vancouver BC  V5P 3Y2
Phone: (604) 321-8712
Fax: (604) 321-2446

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANNE PUI KWAN HO-ASJOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO-ASJOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991