Ho-Tai, Lily Marie (CPSO#: 59433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4054
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
7155 Woodbine Ave # 125
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
Fax: (905) 946-0225
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Crescent Oral Surgery
9251 Yonge Street Suite #400
4th Floor
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-8006
Fax: (905) 889-8866
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Crescent Oral Surgery
1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite # 500
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-5223
Fax: (416) 752-5500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

GTA Endoscopy Services Inc.
305 Milner Ave Suite 920
Toronto ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: (416) 321-5162
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Crescent Oral Surgery
236 Wellington Street East
Suite 200
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5
Canada
Phone: (905) 713-9990
Fax: (905) 713-0135
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
1366 Yonge Street Unit 301
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: 416 435 3747
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Digestive Health Clinic
330 Highway 7 E
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: 905 707 5007
Fax: 905 707 5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILY MARIE HO-TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO-TAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989