Hobbs, Barry Brandon (CPSO#: 20872)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Brandon Hobbs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: London X-Ray Associates 450 Central Avenue London ON N6B 2E8
Date Received: 18 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017