Hobbs, Robert Neil (CPSO#: 42260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frontenac Medical Associates
791 Princess Street
Suite 201
Kingston ON  K7L 1E5
Phone: (613) 544-2727
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PO Box 340
Sahtu Health and Social Services
Norman Wells
Norman Wells NT  X0E 0V0
Canada
Phone: 867-587-3651
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hobbs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hobbs ( CPSO# 42260 )

Business Address:
Frontenac Medical Associates
791 Princess Street
Suite 201
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Business Address:
Sahto HSS
Mackenzie Drive
Norman Wells NT  X0E 0V0

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL HOBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBBS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1987