Hobson, John William (CPSO#: 52673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
73 Delhi Street
Suite 302
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 822-4521
Fax: (519) 822-0030
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

932 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Canada
Phone: (519) 585-2145
Fax: (519) 5792294
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John W. Hobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hobson ( CPSO# 52673 )

Business Address:
73 Delhi Street
Suite 302
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 822-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM HOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2009 to 03 Apr 2009
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989