Hochhauser, Leonhard (CPSO#: 51013)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 21 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992