Hochman, Gary Paul (CPSO#: 33401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2004
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. M. Rooney ( CPSO# 51506 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. N. Just ( CPSO# 70679 )
Dr. S. Isaacson ( CPSO# 55070 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. R. Hany ( CPSO# 54238 )
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Hochman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )

Business Address:
MacKenzie Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 105
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
Units 3, 4 and 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3

Business Address:
136 Forest Lane Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 3N8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY PAUL HOCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCHMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1982