Hochman, Jacqueline Regan (CPSO#: 76206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
4th floor, Room 4136
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 6344
Fax: (416) 323-6115
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Athlete's Care
2401 Yonge Street
Suite LL01
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 544-9065
Fax: (416) 544-9063
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hochman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hochman ( CPSO# 76206 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
4th Floor Suite 101
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
2401 Yonge Street
Suite LL01
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 544-9065

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE REGAN HOCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006