Hochman, Karen Michele (CPSO#: 61954)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 1993