Hockmann, Edgar Rudolf (CPSO#: 87257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 4164382911 Ext. 3315
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edgar Hockmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hockmann ( CPSO# 87257 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critcial Care Medicine
Suite M3-200 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDGAR RUDOLF HOCKMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCKMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007