Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hodaie, Mojgan (CPSO#: 70218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
4W W - 443
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6441
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mojgan Hodaie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hodaie ( CPSO# 70218 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
4WW-443
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 666-9766


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOJGAN HODAIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODAIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2003